TN HB1453 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, institutes a two-year waiver of the use of student growth data from the TNReady assessment in teacher evaluations; requires the state board, in consultation with the department of education, to study, and to provide a written report on, the TNReady assessment to the education committees of the senate and the house. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, institutes a two-year waiver of the use of student growth data from the TNReady assessment in teacher evaluations; requires the state board, in consultation with the department of education, to study, and to provide a written report on, the TNReady assessment to the education committees of the senate and the house. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-17HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
2016-02-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/17/2016
2016-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-13HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2016-01-13HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2016-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-12-21HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2242 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback