TN HB1449 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds to sentencing considerations available community-based alternatives to confinement and the benefits that imposing such alternatives may provide to the community should be considered when the offense is nonviolent and the defendant is the primary caregiver of a dependent child. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds to sentencing considerations available community-based alternatives to confinement and the benefits that imposing such alternatives may provide to the community should be considered when the offense is nonviolent and the defendant is the primary caregiver of a dependent child. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 41.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 309
2019-04-22HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0985 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 309

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback