TN HB1446 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows a law enforcement officer or person who has a relationship with the respondent to petition a court for the issuance of an extreme risk protection order based on clear and convincing evidence that the respondent poses a significant risk of causing personal injury to the respondent or others by possessing a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows a law enforcement officer or person who has a relationship with the respondent to petition a court for the issuance of an extreme risk protection order based on clear and convincing evidence that the respondent poses a significant risk of causing personal injury to the respondent or others by possessing a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1178 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback