TN HB1443 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Pub. Ch. 649
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces, from 60 days to 21 days, the maximum period of time in which a person engaged in towing and storing motor vehicles may charge the vehicle's owner or lienholder a storage fee; decreases the period in which notification must be given under present law by persons engaged in the business of towing and storing motor vehicles to the last known registered owner and all lienholders of a vehicle from at least 14 days to at least 10 days prior to charging a storage fee; revises the applicability of the Motor Vehicle Storage Act to remove the exemption for counties with a metropolitan form of government. - Amends TCA Title 47 and Title 55, Chapter 23.
Title
As enacted, reduces, from 60 days to 21 days, the maximum period of time in which a person engaged in towing and storing motor vehicles may charge the vehicle's owner or lienholder a storage fee; decreases the period in which notification must be given under present law by persons engaged in the business of towing and storing motor vehicles to the last known registered owner and all lienholders of a vehicle from at least 14 days to at least 10 days prior to charging a storage fee; revises the applicability of the Motor Vehicle Storage Act to remove the exemption for counties with a metropolitan form of government. - Amends TCA Title 47 and Title 55, Chapter 23.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Pub. Ch. 649 | |
2016-04-08 | Effective date(s) 03/29/2016 | |
2016-03-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-03-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-03-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-03-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0656) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0621) |
2016-03-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0645) |
2016-02-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/25/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-12-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1476 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 649