TN HB1440 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from within 45 days to within 60 days of the date of judgment, the timeframe for the court clerk to forward to the Tennessee bureau of investigation a copy of the judgment and date of birth of all persons required to be included on the drug offender registry. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 16; Title 33; Title 37; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 53; Title 55; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 1/26/2022 |
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1527 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee