TN HB1438 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the 4 percent state sales tax on food for human consumption; increases the tax on cigarettes from three cents per cigarette to 8.35 cents per cigarette; increases the tax on other tobacco products from 6.6 percent to 17 percent of the wholesale cost price. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1522 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee