TN HB1433 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, classifies the offense of reckless endangerment by discharging a firearm from within a motor vehicle as a Class C felony. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41, relative to sentencing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 505
2021-05-05HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2021
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-05-03HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 5/3/2021
2021-05-03HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced behind the budget
2021-04-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-04-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-23HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1373 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 505

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback