TN HB1433 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, authorizes Lawrence County to establish a part-time clerk of the grand jury, to be appointed by and serve at the pleasure of the foreman of the grand jury.
Title
Subject to local approval, authorizes Lawrence County to establish a part-time clerk of the grand jury, to be appointed by and serve at the pleasure of the foreman of the grand jury.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pr. Ch. 13 | |
2017-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1445 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 13