TN HB1427 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the required hours for an aesthetician student from 150 hours to 175 hours. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to licensed aestheticians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1099 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee