TN HB1425 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from one to two the number of additional dual enrollment courses a student may take under a dual enrollment grant under certain circumstances; allows an eligible student to receive a dual enrollment grant for no more than 10 courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from one to two the number of additional dual enrollment courses a student may take under a dual enrollment grant under certain circumstances; allows an eligible student to receive a dual enrollment grant for no more than 10 courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-16HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-02HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-19HouseDef. to Lottery Calendar
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0764 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback