TN HB1425 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Def. to Lottery Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases from one to two the number of additional dual enrollment courses a student may take under a dual enrollment grant under certain circumstances; allows an eligible student to receive a dual enrollment grant for no more than 10 courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases from one to two the number of additional dual enrollment courses a student may take under a dual enrollment grant under certain circumstances; allows an eligible student to receive a dual enrollment grant for no more than 10 courses. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseDef. to Lottery Calendar
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0764 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback