TN HB1423 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 30 to 20 days following the availability of sufficient data, the period within which a historic zoning commission or regional historic zoning commission must grant or deny a request for a certificate of appropriateness. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 66 and Title 67, relative to public planning.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1609 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.