TN HB1423 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits interpreting or amending county charter in a manner inconsistent with state law with respect to the duties, qualifications, and privileges of the constitutional county offices of sheriff, register, county clerk, assessor of property, or trustee. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits interpreting or amending county charter in a manner inconsistent with state law with respect to the duties, qualifications, and privileges of the constitutional county offices of sheriff, register, county clerk, assessor of property, or trustee. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 2.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Pub. Ch. 458
2019-05-29 Effective date(s) 05/22/2019
2019-05-22 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0354)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0501 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 458

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback