TN HB1423 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-13 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires any person 76 years of age or older, who applies for renewal of a driver license on or after July 1, 2016, to undergo and pass a vision test unless the person submits a written statement that indicates the specifics of the person’s vision and the need for any corrective lenses within six months of the renewal from a licensed ophthalmologist or optometrist in good standing. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires any person 76 years of age or older, who applies for renewal of a driver license on or after July 1, 2016, to undergo and pass a vision test unless the person submits a written statement that indicates the specifics of the person’s vision and the need for any corrective lenses within six months of the renewal from a licensed ophthalmologist or optometrist in good standing. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-13HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2016-01-13HouseP2C, ref. to Transportation Committee--Government Operations for review
2016-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-11-05HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback