TN HB1423 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that reports concerning property that may be subject to escheat must be filed with the treasurer within 60 days of obtaining knowledge that property may be subject to escheat. - Amends TCA Title 31.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that reports concerning property that may be subject to escheat must be filed with the treasurer within 60 days of obtaining knowledge that property may be subject to escheat. - Amends TCA Title 31.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-01 Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary
2011-02-23 P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee
2011-02-17 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0963 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback