TN HB1423 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 598
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Athletic Commission Act of 2008, which regulates professional and amateur unarmed combat contests. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 115.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Athletic Commission Act of 2008, which regulates professional and amateur unarmed combat contests. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 115.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Pub. Ch. 598 | |
2009-07-16 | Effective date(s) 07/08/09 | |
2009-07-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-30 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-30 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-18 | Passed S., Ayes 27, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-18 | Am. 1 withdrawn. | |
2009-06-18 | Motion to reconsider adopted. | |
2009-06-18 | Lift from table motion to reconsider | |
2009-06-18 | Placed on Sen. Message Calendar (1) cal. for 06/18/2009 | |
2009-06-17 | H. returned. | |
2009-06-17 | S. Recalled from H. | |
2009-06-16 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-16 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2009-06-16 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-08 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-04 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-04 | Am. no. 1 withdrawn. | |
2009-06-04 | H. adopted am. no. 2 & 3 | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/4/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Action Def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 6/3/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to last calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Utilities & Banking of COM for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to s/c Utilities & Banking of COM | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Commerce | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1579 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 598