TN HB1419 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Failed in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Failed in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, raises the minimum age from 18 to 21 to purchase any tobacco or vapor products; creates a Class C misdemeanor of selling or distributing flavored electronic cigarettes; increases the tax rate on cigarettes by 1.25 cents per cigarette. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, raises the minimum age from 18 to 21 to purchase any tobacco or vapor products; creates a Class C misdemeanor of selling or distributing flavored electronic cigarettes; increases the tax rate on cigarettes by 1.25 cents per cigarette. - Amends TCA Section 1-3-113; Title 39 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Failed in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0738 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee