TN HB1419 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-16)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-16)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 712
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the evaluation of teachers and principals. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the evaluation of teachers and principals. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 712 | |
2016-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-23 | House | Sponsor change. |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-10-28 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2508 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 712
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1419&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1419.pdf |