TN HB1413 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1074
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that any petition regarding child custody include an affirmative statement setting out all applicable adjudications, if the petitioner knows whether a child has ever been adjudicated by a court as a dependent and neglected or abused child or whether any party to the action has ever been adjudicated by a court as the perpetrator of dependency and neglect or abuse of a minor child; authorizes court to order DCS to disclose certain information. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that any petition regarding child custody include an affirmative statement setting out all applicable adjudications, if the petitioner knows whether a child has ever been adjudicated by a court as a dependent and neglected or abused child or whether any party to the action has ever been adjudicated by a court as the perpetrator of dependency and neglect or abuse of a minor child; authorizes court to order DCS to disclose certain information. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1074
2016-05-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-05-20 Signed by Governor.
2016-05-09HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-04-22HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2016-04-20HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 89, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1413
2016-04-20HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/20/2016
2016-04-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2016-04-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1014)
2016-04-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2016-03-31SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2016-03-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2016-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-30HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2016-03-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0791)
2016-03-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2016
2016-03-23HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016
2016-03-15HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-03-15HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/22/2016
2016-03-09HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/15/2016
2016-03-09HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2016-03-02HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2016
2016-03-02HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2016
2016-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016
2016-02-10HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2016-02-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/10/2016
2016-01-13HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2016-01-13HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2016-01-12HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-09-17HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1436 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1074

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback