TN HB1413 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 266
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 266
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the present requirements for an historic interpretive center, which applies to the Center for Southern Folklore in Memphis, to no longer have the location of the center being in a restored theater but instead place the location of the center in an historic area where structures listed on the national register of historic places are located. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Title
As enacted, revises the present requirements for an historic interpretive center, which applies to the Center for Southern Folklore in Memphis, to no longer have the location of the center being in a restored theater but instead place the location of the center in an historic area where structures listed on the national register of historic places are located. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-102.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 266 | |
2009-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/20/09 | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-12 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-05-12 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-11 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-07 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-05-07 | Passed S., Ayes 21, Nays 3 | |
2009-05-07 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-04-13 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-04-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-04-09 | Passed H., Ayes 73, Nays 14,. PNV 6 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-13 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1753 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 266