TN HB1411 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Meeting Canceled
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes requirements for providers operating websites offering consumer access to interactive software that generates legal documents based on consumer answers. - Amends TCA Title 23.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes requirements for providers operating websites offering consumer access to interactive software that generates legal documents based on consumer answers. - Amends TCA Title 23.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-02-19HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1424 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback