TN HB1410 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Safe Stars Act" to establish and revise various safety and health requirements for school youth athletic activities and community-based youth athletic activities. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 68, relative to athletics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 272
2021-04-19HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021
2021-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31HouseAction def. in Education Administration to 4/7/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021
2021-03-23HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2021-02-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-22HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1259 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 272

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback