TN HB1410 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 581
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, defines agriculture to include entertainment activities that occur on land where farm products and nursery stock are produced; requires that the Tennessee Right to Farm Act be construed broadly to effectuate its purposes. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3, Part 1; Title 43, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 43, Chapter 26, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, defines agriculture to include entertainment activities that occur on land where farm products and nursery stock are produced; requires that the Tennessee Right to Farm Act be construed broadly to effectuate its purposes. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3, Part 1; Title 43, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 43, Chapter 26, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 581
2014-03-10HouseComp. SB subst.
2014-03-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2014
2014-03-03HouseReset on Regular cal. for 3/10/14
2014-02-27HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2014
2014-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/27/2014
2014-02-25HouseRec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2014-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/25/2014
2014-02-18HouseAction Def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 2/25/2014
2014-02-12HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/18/2014
2014-02-12HouseRec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2014-02-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/12/2014
2014-01-15HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2014-01-15HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2014-01-14HouseIntro., P1C.
2014-01-13HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1614 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 581

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback