TN HB1408 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Def. to Summer Study in Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Def. to Summer Study in Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Private Prison Alignment Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Private Prison Alignment Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Corrections Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0938 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee