TN HB1407 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the expenditure of state or local funds or employees to implement, regulate, or enforce any federal law or executive order regulating the ownership or possession of firearms or firearm ammunition regardless of whether the expenditure of funds or use of employees would violate a state law or the state constitution. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the expenditure of state or local funds or employees to implement, regulate, or enforce any federal law or executive order regulating the ownership or possession of firearms or firearm ammunition regardless of whether the expenditure of funds or use of employees would violate a state law or the state constitution. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 3, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
2018-01-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 1/17/2018
2017-03-29HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2018
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0146 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback