TN HB1406 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires law enforcement agencies to develop certain policies regarding the use of force; prohibits magistrates from issuing no-knock warrants; establishes certain reporting requirements. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal justice.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 489
2021-05-03HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-05-03HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/27/2021
2021-04-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-04-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-04-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/21/2021
2021-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2021-03-01HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-25HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-22HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1380 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback