TN HB1406 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 819
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 819
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Veterinary Practice Act, such as specifying that the "practice of veterinary medicine" occurs wherever the patient is at the time services are rendered and authorizing the board of veterinary medical examiners to deny, suspend or revoke any license or to otherwise discipline an applicant or licensee who is found guilty by the board of practicing veterinary medicine without establishing and maintaining a valid veterinarian-client-patient relationship. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the Tennessee Veterinary Practice Act, such as specifying that the "practice of veterinary medicine" occurs wherever the patient is at the time services are rendered and authorizing the board of veterinary medical examiners to deny, suspend or revoke any license or to otherwise discipline an applicant or licensee who is found guilty by the board of practicing veterinary medicine without establishing and maintaining a valid veterinarian-client-patient relationship. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 819 | |
2016-04-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee--Business & Utilities |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-08-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1429 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 819
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1406&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1406.pdf |