TN HB1406 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 821
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 821
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates dogs and cats that are adopted from Tennessee animal shelters as the official state pet. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, designates dogs and cats that are adopted from Tennessee animal shelters as the official state pet. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 821 |
2014-04-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar 2 for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to Next Calendar |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Sponsor change. |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1495 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 821