TN HB1395 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commission to make its comprehensive report on the status of children and youth in Tennessee available to the public by publishing the report on the commission's website. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
As introduced, requires the commission to make its comprehensive report on the status of children and youth in Tennessee available to the public by publishing the report on the commission's website. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Families Subcommittee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1152 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee