TN HB1394 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to provide LEAs with access to their students' TCAP and end-of-course assessment items and the students' answers within 60 days following the administration of the assessments; requires an LEA to provide each teacher with access to the teacher's students' assessment information within 90 days following the administration of the assessments; requires that the provided information include all questions posed to students. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of education to provide LEAs with access to their students' TCAP and end-of-course assessment items and the students' answers within 60 days following the administration of the assessments; requires an LEA to provide each teacher with access to the teacher's students' assessment information within 90 days following the administration of the assessments; requires that the provided information include all questions posed to students. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action def. in Education to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1267 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee