TN HB1391 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that only 5 percent of the evaluation criteria used to evaluate all teachers and principals be comprised of student achievement data based on student growth generated by assessments administered to students enrolled in an English as a second language (ESL) program with limited English proficiency. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that only 5 percent of the evaluation criteria used to evaluate all teachers and principals be comprised of student achievement data based on student growth generated by assessments administered to students enrolled in an English as a second language (ESL) program with limited English proficiency. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseWithdrawn.
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1503 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback