TN HB1391 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from sales and use tax the sale or use of tangible personal property purchased through or in connection with a classroom sponsored book club program. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, exempts from sales and use tax the sale or use of tangible personal property purchased through or in connection with a classroom sponsored book club program. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1491 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1391&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1391.pdf |