TN HB1391 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 205
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 205
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding deferred presentment services. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 17.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of law regarding deferred presentment services. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 205 | |
2011-05-04 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-04-28 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1557 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 205