TN HB1390 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pr. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pr. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various charter revisions including clarifying powers of the board may be exercised by ordinance, resolution or motion; clarifying how vacancy filled when an alderman becomes mayor; revising bond requirements for employees who handle money; clarifying when employee may request hearing prior to termination; clarifying that competitive bidding is required only when a contract involves expenditure of city funds. - Amends Chapter 76 of the Private Acts of 1917; as amended.
Title
As introduced, makes various charter revisions including clarifying powers of the board may be exercised by ordinance, resolution or motion; clarifying how vacancy filled when an alderman becomes mayor; revising bond requirements for employees who handle money; clarifying when employee may request hearing prior to termination; clarifying that competitive bidding is required only when a contract involves expenditure of city funds. - Amends Chapter 76 of the Private Acts of 1917; as amended.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pr. Ch. 9 | |
2015-04-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-03-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1415 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 9