TN HB1387 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires out-of-state sellers with more than $100,000 in sales or more than 200 separate sales in this state during previous 12-month period to collect and remit sales tax to department of revenue rather than having in-state consumers remit the use tax for purchases made from such dealers. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Title
As introduced, requires out-of-state sellers with more than $100,000 in sales or more than 200 separate sales in this state during previous 12-month period to collect and remit sales tax to department of revenue rather than having in-state consumers remit the use tax for purchases made from such dealers. - Amends TCA Title 49; Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] |
Rep. Esther Helton-Haynes [R] | Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] |
Rep. Mary Littleton [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Rep. David Byrd [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2020-06-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1011) |
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1457 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee