TN HB1385 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines "intent to go armed," for purposes of the criminal offenses of unlawful carrying of a weapon, carrying weapons on school property, and carrying weapons in public parks or other recreational grounds, as carrying or wearing a weapon with premeditation and forethought to commit an infamous crime. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to weapons.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0816 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-07 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee