TN HB1384 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 270
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, repeals statutory fee structure for licenses and permits, with certain exceptions; authorizes the fish and wildlife commission to promulgate rules to abolish license years and establish an annual license system. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 70, Chapter 2, relative to licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] | Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 270 | |
2021-04-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1199 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-05 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021