TN HB1384 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to create a training program for LEAs and teachers evaluated using a growth portfolio model for pre-K-K teachers; allows an LEA to create an alternative growth portfolio model to measure the academic growth of pre-K-K students. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to create a training program for LEAs and teachers evaluated using a growth portfolio model for pre-K-K teachers; allows an LEA to create an alternative growth portfolio model to measure the academic growth of pre-K-K students. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0509 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee