TN HB1382 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Placed on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
Pending: House Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Fair Repair Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 55 and Title 62.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Fair Repair Act." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 55 and Title 62.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 3/22/17
2017-03-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0888 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback