TN HB1382 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pr. Ch. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, pursuant to the request of the Gibson County special school district, permits the district to issue bonds or notes in an amount of $3 million or less and to issue bond, revenue, and grant anticipation notes. - Amends Chapter 62 of the Private Acts of 1981.
Title
As introduced, pursuant to the request of the Gibson County special school district, permits the district to issue bonds or notes in an amount of $3 million or less and to issue bond, revenue, and grant anticipation notes. - Amends Chapter 62 of the Private Acts of 1981.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Pr. Ch. 3 | |
2015-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1405 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 3