TN HB1381 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes a third-grade student who is not proficient in English language arts (ELA) to be promoted to fourth grade if at least 66 percent of the third-grade students in the student's LEA or public charter school test proficient on the ELA portion of the most recently administered Tennessee comprehensive assessment program test and if the student's parent or guardian, teacher, and school principal mutually agree and recommend in writing that the student should be promoted to fourth grade. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to third-grade students.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
2023-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/14/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0818 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback