TN HB1381 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TSAC to report for each academic year, beginning with the 2017-2018 academic year, the number of students eligible for a Tennessee HOPE scholarship for achieving at least a 3.0 GPA, for attaining a composite ACT score of at least 21 or a concordant equivalent score on the SAT, and the number of students achieving both, to the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives, and to the public on its website, by October 15 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, requires TSAC to report for each academic year, beginning with the 2017-2018 academic year, the number of students eligible for a Tennessee HOPE scholarship for achieving at least a 3.0 GPA, for attaining a composite ACT score of at least 21 or a concordant equivalent score on the SAT, and the number of students achieving both, to the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives, and to the public on its website, by October 15 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1453 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee