TN HB1380 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pr. Ch. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel motel tax from the amount of five percent to the amount of seven percent; requires revenues generated from such increase to be used solely to promote tourism in the county. - Amends amend Chapter 15 of the Private Acts of 1995.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, increases the hotel motel tax from the amount of five percent to the amount of seven percent; requires revenues generated from such increase to be used solely to promote tourism in the county. - Amends amend Chapter 15 of the Private Acts of 1995.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Pr. Ch. 14 | |
2015-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-05-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-23 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 5, PNV 4 |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to hotel tax calendar |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-19 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1403 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 14