TN HB1379 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to publish the annual permit fee schedule to operate an organized camp on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 11; Title 49; Title 68 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 11; Title 49; Title 68 and Title 70, relative to camps.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2023-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2023-03-13HouseRef. to Health Committee -- Civil Justice Committee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1044 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback