TN HB1377 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Eli's Law," which creates a presumption that any child born to a parent, from whose custody a child has previously been removed for being dependent or neglected and the child who was previously removed is in the custody of the department of children's services, may be dependent or neglected and that it is in the best interest of both children that the child's birth be brought to the court's attention; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 37, relative to dependent and neglected children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 568 | |
2021-05-26 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0327) |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-28 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0309) |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0867 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 568