TN HB1377 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, modifies the basic education program funding to allow school districts that do not receive 80 percent ADM funding to receive a 3 percent increase in funding until the school district is at 80 percent funding. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, modifies the basic education program funding to allow school districts that do not receive 80 percent ADM funding to receive a 3 percent increase in funding until the school district is at 80 percent funding. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2018 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0898 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee