TN HB1371 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits notaries public to solemnize marriages. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 16 and Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 16 and Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to marriage.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 255 | |
2021-04-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/21 |
2021-04-05 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0509 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Effective date(s) 4/28/2021