TN HB1368 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-13)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases the compensation from $25,000 to a $250,000 annuity payable in five annual installments of $50,000, paid to the estate of a firefighter, volunteer rescue squad worker, or law enforcement officer who dies in the line of duty; revises related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 9 and Title 68, Chapter 140.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, increases the compensation from $25,000 to a $250,000 annuity payable in five annual installments of $50,000, paid to the estate of a firefighter, volunteer rescue squad worker, or law enforcement officer who dies in the line of duty; revises related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 2; Title 9 and Title 68, Chapter 140.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 445
2017-05-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-09HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-05-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Local Calendar
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017
2017-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2017-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1059 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-30 - Pub. Ch. 445

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback