TN HB1368 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a grant program to assist veterans with the creation and opening of small businesses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 58.
Title
As introduced, creates a grant program to assist veterans with the creation and opening of small businesses. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9 and Title 58.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) BUSINESS AND UTILITIES SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Business and Utilities Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2014-01-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee--Government Operations for review |
2014-01-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-10-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1428 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Gov't Ops. comm