TN HB1366 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Def. to Summer Study in Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, clarifies that the time period in which insurance premiums deducted from the salaries of participating employees to be deposited into the county insurance fund is three calendar days rather than three business days. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, clarifies that the time period in which insurance premiums deducted from the salaries of participating employees to be deposited into the county insurance fund is three calendar days rather than three business days. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseDef. to Summer Study in Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRef. to State Committee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1502 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback